Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#335 | Journal Page: 1951 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1942 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1942 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 846 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 846 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |