E
|
05/29/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4492
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1088
|
Journal Page: 4492
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4492
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4309
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1942
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1942
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to House Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|