Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3723
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3685
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3685
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
12/18/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|