House | 05/04/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 881 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 881 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |