Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4311 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 4311
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 22, 2009, reported
 favorably, as amended, by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Davis
 Amend H.B. No. 4311 by striking all below the enacting clause
 and substituting the following:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter Y to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER Y. DEPARTMENT BUILDING NAMES
 Sec. 201.2001.  HONORABLE HILARY B. DORAN TRANSPORTATION
 BUILDING. The building in which, on June 1, 2009, is located the
 office of the area engineer for Val Verde County is designated as
 the Honorable Hilary B. Doran Transportation Building.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.072 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.072.  LOOP 79 IN VAL VERDE COUNTY. (a) In
 recognition of the cooperation between the department and Val Verde
 County, the designation of Loop 79 in Val Verde County shall be made
 by the Commissioners Court of Val Verde County.
 (b)  The department shall design and construct markers to be
 placed along Loop 79 in Val Verde County indicating the highway
 number, the designation of the loop, and any other appropriate
 information.
 (c)  The department shall erect a marker at each end of the
 loop and at intermediate sites along the loop that the department
 determines are appropriate.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the naming of certain Texas Department of
 Transportation property in Val Verde County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter P to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER P.  DEPARTMENT REGIONAL AND AREA OFFICES
 Sec. 201.1000.  VAL VERDE COUNTY AREA OFFICE. The office of
 the area engineer located in Val Verde County is designated as the
 Honorable Hilary B. Doran Transportation Building.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.071. DESIGNATION OF HIGHWAY LOOP IN VAL VERDE
 COUNTY. (a) In recognition of the cooperation between the
 department and the County of Val Verde, the name of Loop ____
 located in Val Verde County shall be designated by the Val Verde
 County Commissioners Court.
 (b)  Upon the naming of Loop ____ by the Val Verde County
 Commissioners Court, the department shall design and construct
 markers to be placed along Loop ____ indicating the highway number,
 the name of the loop, and any other appropriate information.
 (c)  The department shall erect a marker at each end of the
 loop and at intermediate sites along the loop that the department
 determines are appropriate.
 SECTION 3. Section 1 of this Act takes effect immediately if
 this Act receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to
 each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, Section 1 of this Act takes effect September 1,
 2009. Section 2 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2010.
 * * * * *