Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4311 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4311


 AN ACT
 relating to the naming of certain Texas Department of
 Transportation property in Val Verde County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter Y to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER Y. DEPARTMENT BUILDING NAMES
 Sec. 201.2001.  HONORABLE HILARY B. DORAN TRANSPORTATION
 BUILDING. The building in which, on June 1, 2009, is located the
 office of the area engineer for Val Verde County is designated as
 the Honorable Hilary B. Doran Transportation Building.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.072 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.072.  LOOP 79 IN VAL VERDE COUNTY. (a) In
 recognition of the cooperation between the department and Val Verde
 County, the designation of Loop 79 in Val Verde County shall be made
 by the Commissioners Court of Val Verde County.
 (b)  The department shall design and construct markers to be
 placed along Loop 79 in Val Verde County indicating the highway
 number, the designation of the loop, and any other appropriate
 information.
 (c)  The department shall erect a marker at each end of the
 loop and at intermediate sites along the loop that the department
 determines are appropriate.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4311 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4311 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4311 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor