H.B. No. 4311 AN ACT relating to the naming of certain Texas Department of Transportation property in Val Verde County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Subchapter Y to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER Y. DEPARTMENT BUILDING NAMES Sec. 201.2001. HONORABLE HILARY B. DORAN TRANSPORTATION BUILDING. The building in which, on June 1, 2009, is located the office of the area engineer for Val Verde County is designated as the Honorable Hilary B. Doran Transportation Building. SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 225.072 to read as follows: Sec. 225.072. LOOP 79 IN VAL VERDE COUNTY. (a) In recognition of the cooperation between the department and Val Verde County, the designation of Loop 79 in Val Verde County shall be made by the Commissioners Court of Val Verde County. (b) The department shall design and construct markers to be placed along Loop 79 in Val Verde County indicating the highway number, the designation of the loop, and any other appropriate information. (c) The department shall erect a marker at each end of the loop and at intermediate sites along the loop that the department determines are appropriate. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4311 was passed by the House on April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 4311 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4311 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor