Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4407 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Taylor, Shelton (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 4407
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rules concerning administration and maintenance of
 anaphylaxis medicine on public school campuses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.0151 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.0151.  RULES CONCERNING ADMINISTRATION AND
 MAINTENANCE OF ANAPHYLAXIS MEDICINE ON CAMPUS. (a) The
 commissioner by rule shall:
 (1)  adopt standardized procedures for school
 personnel to follow if a person on campus experiences an
 anaphylactic reaction;
 (2)  require each school district to maintain a
 physician's standing order under which a school nurse is authorized
 to administer anaphylaxis medicine to a person on campus
 experiencing an anaphylactic reaction; and
 (3)  require a district to maintain at each campus at
 which a school nurse serves on a part-time or full-time basis a
 supply of anaphylaxis medicine for administration to a person on
 campus experiencing an anaphylactic reaction for the first time.
 (b)  In adopting rules under Subsection (a), the
 commissioner shall consult with one or more physicians experienced
 in treating persons experiencing an anaphylactic reaction.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *