E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5122 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3184 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2391 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3217 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3217 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3217 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3217 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3198 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3198 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 916 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 916 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |