1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 4498 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 28, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended |
---|
8 | 8 | | by adding Section 28.101 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | Sec. 28.101. PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a) This section applies |
---|
10 | 10 | | only to a mixed beverage permit holder whose premises are located in |
---|
11 | 11 | | a municipality that: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) has a population of less than 15,000; |
---|
13 | 13 | | (2) is located in a county with a population of less |
---|
14 | 14 | | than 65,000; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) contains a historic preservation district that |
---|
16 | 16 | | borders a lake. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 28.10 or any other law, the |
---|
18 | 18 | | holder of a mixed beverage permit whose permitted premises are |
---|
19 | 19 | | located on property owned by a municipality that contains a |
---|
20 | 20 | | municipally owned conference center and that borders a lake may |
---|
21 | 21 | | permit a patron to leave the permitted premises, even though the |
---|
22 | 22 | | patron possesses an alcoholic beverage, if: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) the beverage is in an open container and appears to |
---|
24 | 24 | | be possessed for present consumption; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or |
---|
26 | 26 | | possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not |
---|
27 | 27 | | prohibited on the municipally owned property where the permitted |
---|
28 | 28 | | premises are located. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (c) This section does not affect the prohibition against |
---|
30 | 30 | | possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle |
---|
31 | 31 | | under Section 49.031, Penal Code. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 31, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended |
---|
33 | 33 | | by adding Section 31.06 to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 31.06. PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a) This section applies |
---|
35 | 35 | | only to the holder of a caterer's permit operating under the permit |
---|
36 | 36 | | in an area in a municipality that: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (1) has a population of less than 15,000; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) is located in a county with a population of less |
---|
39 | 39 | | than 65,000; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) contains a historic preservation district that |
---|
41 | 41 | | borders a lake. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other law, the holder of a caterer's |
---|
43 | 43 | | permit operating under the permit in an area located on property |
---|
44 | 44 | | owned by a municipality that contains a municipally owned |
---|
45 | 45 | | conference center and that borders a lake may permit a patron to |
---|
46 | 46 | | leave the area, even though the patron possesses an alcoholic |
---|
47 | 47 | | beverage, if: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) the beverage is in an open container and appears to |
---|
49 | 49 | | be possessed for present consumption; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or |
---|
51 | 51 | | possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not |
---|
52 | 52 | | prohibited on the municipally owned property where the area is |
---|
53 | 53 | | located. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (c) This section does not affect the prohibition against |
---|
55 | 55 | | possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle |
---|
56 | 56 | | under Section 49.031, Penal Code. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 3. Section 501.035(c), Election Code, is amended to |
---|
58 | 58 | | read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (c) In an area where the sale of any type or classification |
---|
60 | 60 | | of [all] alcoholic beverages [including mixed beverages] has been |
---|
61 | 61 | | legalized, the ballot for a prohibitory election shall be prepared |
---|
62 | 62 | | to permit voting for or against the one of the following issues that |
---|
63 | 63 | | applies: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) "The legal sale of beer for off-premise |
---|
65 | 65 | | consumption only." |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) "The legal sale of beer." |
---|
67 | 67 | | (3) "The legal sale of beer and wine for off-premise |
---|
68 | 68 | | consumption only." |
---|
69 | 69 | | (4) "The legal sale of beer and wine." |
---|
70 | 70 | | (5) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages for |
---|
71 | 71 | | off-premise consumption only." |
---|
72 | 72 | | (6) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages except |
---|
73 | 73 | | mixed beverages." |
---|
74 | 74 | | (7) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages |
---|
75 | 75 | | including mixed beverages." |
---|
76 | 76 | | (8) "The legal sale of mixed beverages." |
---|
77 | 77 | | (9) "The legal sale of mixed beverages in restaurants |
---|
78 | 78 | | by food and beverage certificate holders only." |
---|
79 | 79 | | (10) "The legal sale of wine on the premises of a |
---|
80 | 80 | | holder of a winery permit." |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 4. Sections 501.035(d), (e), and (f), Election |
---|
82 | 82 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
86 | 86 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4498 was passed by the House on April |
---|
87 | 87 | | 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
88 | 88 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
89 | 89 | | H.B. No. 4498 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
90 | 90 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
91 | 91 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
92 | 92 | | on H.B. No. 4498 on May 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, |
---|
93 | 93 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
94 | 94 | | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | 95 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
96 | 96 | | I certify that H.B. No. 4498 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
97 | 97 | | amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
98 | 98 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
99 | 99 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
100 | 100 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
101 | 101 | | 4498 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
102 | 102 | | ______________________________ |
---|
103 | 103 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
104 | 104 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
105 | 105 | | Date |
---|
106 | 106 | | __________________ |
---|
107 | 107 | | Governor |
---|