Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4498 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4498


 AN ACT
 relating to the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 28, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 28.101 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.101.  PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a)  This section applies
 only to a mixed beverage permit holder whose premises are located in
 a municipality that:
 (1) has a population of less than 15,000;
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 65,000; and
 (3)  contains a historic preservation district that
 borders a lake.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 28.10 or any other law, the
 holder of a mixed beverage permit whose permitted premises are
 located on property owned by a municipality that contains a
 municipally owned conference center and that borders a lake may
 permit a patron to leave the permitted premises, even though the
 patron possesses an alcoholic beverage, if:
 (1)  the beverage is in an open container and appears to
 be possessed for present consumption; and
 (2)  the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or
 possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not
 prohibited on the municipally owned property where the permitted
 premises are located.
 (c)  This section does not affect the prohibition against
 possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle
 under Section 49.031, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 31, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 31.06 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.06.  PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a)  This section applies
 only to the holder of a caterer's permit operating under the permit
 in an area in a municipality that:
 (1) has a population of less than 15,000;
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 65,000; and
 (3)  contains a historic preservation district that
 borders a lake.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the holder of a caterer's
 permit operating under the permit in an area located on property
 owned by a municipality that contains a municipally owned
 conference center and that borders a lake may permit a patron to
 leave the area, even though the patron possesses an alcoholic
 beverage, if:
 (1)  the beverage is in an open container and appears to
 be possessed for present consumption; and
 (2)  the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or
 possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not
 prohibited on the municipally owned property where the area is
 located.
 (c)  This section does not affect the prohibition against
 possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle
 under Section 49.031, Penal Code.
 SECTION 3. Section 501.035(c), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c) In an area where the sale of any type or classification
 of [all] alcoholic beverages [including mixed beverages] has been
 legalized, the ballot for a prohibitory election shall be prepared
 to permit voting for or against the one of the following issues that
 applies:
 (1) "The legal sale of beer for off-premise
 consumption only."
 (2) "The legal sale of beer."
 (3) "The legal sale of beer and wine for off-premise
 consumption only."
 (4) "The legal sale of beer and wine."
 (5) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages for
 off-premise consumption only."
 (6) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages except
 mixed beverages."
 (7) "The legal sale of all alcoholic beverages
 including mixed beverages."
 (8) "The legal sale of mixed beverages."
 (9) "The legal sale of mixed beverages in restaurants
 by food and beverage certificate holders only."
 (10) "The legal sale of wine on the premises of a
 holder of a winery permit."
 SECTION 4. Sections 501.035(d), (e), and (f), Election
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4498 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 4498 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 4498 on May 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4498 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 4498 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor