House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|