Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 3166 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Rereferred to committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1379 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1685 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1685 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1685 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 950 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 950 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |