1 | 1 | | By: Martinez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 4576 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 12, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Administration; May 23, 2009, rereferred to Committee on |
---|
5 | 5 | | International Relations and Trade; May 25, 2009, reported |
---|
6 | 6 | | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 25, 2009, sent |
---|
7 | 7 | | to printer.) |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the designation of Farm-to-Market Road 1015 in Hidalgo |
---|
13 | 13 | | County as the Bill Summers International Boulevard. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. PURPOSE. The purpose of this Act is to recognize |
---|
16 | 16 | | Bill Summers for his unselfish sacrifices in developing a close |
---|
17 | 17 | | relationship between the Rio Grande Valley and the State of |
---|
18 | 18 | | Tamaulipas, United Mexican States. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 2. AMENDMENT. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 225.077 to read |
---|
21 | 21 | | as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | Sec. 225.077. BILL SUMMERS INTERNATIONAL BOULEVARD. (a) |
---|
23 | 23 | | Farm-to-Market Road 1015 between U.S. Highway 83 and the Progreso |
---|
24 | 24 | | International Bridge is designated as the Bill Summers |
---|
25 | 25 | | International Boulevard. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall |
---|
27 | 27 | | design and construct memorial markers indicating the highway |
---|
28 | 28 | | number, the designation as the Bill Summers International |
---|
29 | 29 | | Boulevard, and any other appropriate information. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) The department shall erect a marker at each end of the |
---|
31 | 31 | | boulevard and at appropriate intermediate sites along the |
---|
32 | 32 | | boulevard. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (d) The requirement that a recognized individual be |
---|
34 | 34 | | deceased under Section 225.001(c) does not apply to this section. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
36 | 36 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
37 | 37 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
38 | 38 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
39 | 39 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
40 | 40 | | * * * * * |
---|