House | 05/05/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Filed |