Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3974
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|