Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4760 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 4760
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the minimum salary that must be paid to county court at
 law judges in Hidalgo County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 25.1102(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c) The judge of a county court at law shall be paid a
 minimum [an] annual salary that is not less than $1,000 less than
 the total annual salary, including supplements, received by a
 district judge in the county. The judge of a county court at law may
 be paid more than the minimum annual salary that the judge is
 required to be paid under this subsection. The salary of a county
 court at law judge shall be paid in the same manner and from the same
 fund as prescribed by law for the county judge of Hidalgo County.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *