Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4767 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 4767


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of days, weeks, and months for
 recognition by concurrent resolution of the legislature.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 391, Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 391. RESOLUTIONS FOR STATE SYMBOLS, [AND] PLACE
 DESIGNATIONS, AND RECOGNITION DAYS, WEEKS, AND MONTHS
 SECTION 2. Section 391.001, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 391.001. EFFECT OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter governs
 the designation of state symbols, [and] place designations, and
 days, weeks, and months for recognition made by the legislature by
 resolution approved by each house of the legislature.
 (b) This chapter does not affect the designation of:
 (1) a state symbol or a place designation made by:
 (A) [(1)] resolution before September 1, 2001;
 or
 (B) [(2)] statute; or
 (2) a day, week, or month for recognition made by:
 (A) resolution before September 1, 2009; or
 (B) statute.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 391, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 391.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 391.004.  DESIGNATING DAYS, WEEKS, OR MONTHS FOR
 RECOGNITION.  (a)  In this section, "date designation" means the
 special observance authorized by the legislature that annually
 recognizes and honors a culturally or historically significant day,
 week, or month in the state.
 (b)  The legislature may assign more than one designation to
 a day, week, or month.
 (c)  Before the legislature may designate a day, week, or
 month for recognition, the legislature must be presented with
 information related to the historical or cultural significance of
 the day, week, or month to be recognized by persons supporting the
 designation.
 (d)  A designation of a day, week, or month for recognition
 expires on the 10th anniversary of the date the legislature finally
 passes the resolution making the designation. This subsection does
 not prevent the legislature from redesignating a day, week, or
 month for recognition during or after the 10-year period.
 SECTION 4. Sections 391.002(c) and 391.003(f), Government
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4767 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4767 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4767 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor