E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5202
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3199
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Allen
|
Journal Page: 3199
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3199
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1756
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|