House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Filed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1575 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#193 | Journal Page: 1575 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1575 |