House | 05/24/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Filed |