House | 05/24/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 4328 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB2570 | Journal Page: 4328 |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3175 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Filed |