E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective on 1/1/10
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
E
|
05/18/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2492
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3947
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 321
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 321
|
House
|
01/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|