E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6236
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2255
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#452
|
Journal Page: 2255
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2255
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2255
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2227
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2227
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2227
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
House
|
01/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|