Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB548 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 548


 AN ACT
 relating to the impoundment of certain motor vehicles involved in
 the commission of the offense of racing on a highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 545.420, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  This subsection applies only to a motor vehicle used in
 the commission of an offense under this section that results in an
 accident with property damage or personal injury. A peace officer
 shall require the vehicle to be taken to the nearest licensed
 vehicle storage facility unless the vehicle is seized as evidence,
 in which case the vehicle may be taken to a storage facility as
 designated by the peace officer involved. Notwithstanding Article
 18.23, Code of Criminal Procedure, the owner of a motor vehicle that
 is removed or stored under this subsection is liable for all removal
 and storage fees incurred and is not entitled to take possession of
 the vehicle until those fees are paid.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense was committed
 before the effective date of this Act if any element of the offense
 was committed before that date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 548 was passed by the House on May 1,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 548 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 548 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 548 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 548 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor