House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 12/25/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3635 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3635 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 4-Vaught | Journal Page: 3600 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3599 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 01/12/2009 | Filed |