Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2289 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#494 | Journal Page: 2288 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2288 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2288 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 327 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 327 | |
House | 01/14/2009 | Filed |