Senate | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1303 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | RV#206 | Journal Page: 1615 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1614 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#194 | Journal Page: 1582 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amended | 1-Farrar | Journal Page: 1582 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 01/20/2009 | Filed |