E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
December 31, 2010
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/04/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6971
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1587
|
Journal Page: 6135
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6134
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5685
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5685
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5685
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2888
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2888
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA2 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1948
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 348
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 348
|
House
|
01/22/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|