1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 715 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to motor vehicle inspection stations that perform |
---|
6 | 6 | | emissions inspections using only the onboard diagnostic system of |
---|
7 | 7 | | inspected vehicles. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 548, Transportation Code, |
---|
10 | 10 | | is amended by adding Section 548.3075 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 548.3075. LIMITED EMISSIONS INSPECTIONS. (a) In this |
---|
12 | 12 | | section, "limited emissions inspection" means an emissions |
---|
13 | 13 | | inspection of a motor vehicle conducted only by using the onboard |
---|
14 | 14 | | diagnostic system of the vehicle. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b) A department rule that allows a qualified inspection |
---|
16 | 16 | | station to perform a limited emissions inspection of a motor |
---|
17 | 17 | | vehicle may not restrict the station to fewer than 150 inspections |
---|
18 | 18 | | per month. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect December 31, 2010. |
---|
20 | 20 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
21 | 21 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
22 | 22 | | I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the House on April |
---|
23 | 23 | | 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
24 | 24 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
25 | 25 | | H.B. No. 715 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
26 | 26 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
27 | 27 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
28 | 28 | | on H.B. No. 715 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
29 | 29 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
30 | 30 | | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | 31 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
32 | 32 | | I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
33 | 33 | | amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
34 | 34 | | 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
35 | 35 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 715 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4. |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | 40 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
41 | 41 | | Date |
---|
42 | 42 | | __________________ |
---|
43 | 43 | | Governor |
---|