H.B. No. 715 AN ACT relating to motor vehicle inspection stations that perform emissions inspections using only the onboard diagnostic system of inspected vehicles. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 548, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 548.3075 to read as follows: Sec. 548.3075. LIMITED EMISSIONS INSPECTIONS. (a) In this section, "limited emissions inspection" means an emissions inspection of a motor vehicle conducted only by using the onboard diagnostic system of the vehicle. (b) A department rule that allows a qualified inspection station to perform a limited emissions inspection of a motor vehicle may not restrict the station to fewer than 150 inspections per month. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect December 31, 2010. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the House on April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 715 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 715 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 715 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 715 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor