Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB72 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 72


 AN ACT
 relating to the waiting period for issuing a decree in certain suits
 for divorce.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 6.702, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The] court
 may not grant a divorce before the 60th day after the date the suit
 was filed. A decree rendered in violation of this subsection is not
 subject to collateral attack.
 (c)  A waiting period is not required under Subsection (a)
 before a court may grant a divorce in a suit in which the court finds
 that:
 (1)  the respondent has been finally convicted of or
 received deferred adjudication for an offense involving family
 violence as defined by Section 71.004 against the petitioner or a
 member of the petitioner's household; or
 (2)  the petitioner has an active protective order
 under Title 4 or an active magistrate's order for emergency
 protection under Article 17.292, Code of Criminal Procedure, based
 on a finding of family violence, against the respondent because of
 family violence committed during the marriage.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a suit for dissolution of a marriage filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A suit for dissolution of a marriage
 filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the suit was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 72 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 72 on May 23, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 72 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 72 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 72 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor