House | 05/08/2009 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 01/22/2009 | Filed |