E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4422
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5361
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5362
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1421
|
Journal Page: 5361
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5361
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5115
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#103
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
House
|
01/22/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|