Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1878
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|