1 | 1 | | 81R4836 CAS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Eissler H.B. No. 851 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to Legislative Budget Board review of and reports to |
---|
8 | 8 | | certain state officials concerning the primary state statutes |
---|
9 | 9 | | governing public education. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 2, Education Code, is amended |
---|
12 | 12 | | by adding Chapter 6 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | CHAPTER 6. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD REVIEW OF TITLES 1 AND 2; |
---|
14 | 14 | | REPORTS TO STATE OFFICIALS |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 6.001. REVIEW; REPORTS. The Legislative Budget Board |
---|
16 | 16 | | shall review the chapters of this title and Title 1 on a 10-year |
---|
17 | 17 | | cycle. Based on each review, the board shall submit a written |
---|
18 | 18 | | report on the chapters reviewed to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
19 | 19 | | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the |
---|
20 | 20 | | chair of each standing committee of the legislature with primary |
---|
21 | 21 | | jurisdiction over public education. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Sec. 6.002. RECOMMENDATIONS. (a) Each report submitted |
---|
23 | 23 | | under Section 6.001 must include any Legislative Budget Board |
---|
24 | 24 | | recommendation that one or more provisions subject to review be: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) eliminated; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) amended to improve the effectiveness of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | provision or of this state's public education system. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) Each recommendation under Subsection (a) must include a |
---|
29 | 29 | | brief explanation of the basis for the recommendation. |
---|
30 | 30 | | Sec. 6.003. ESTABLISHMENT OF CYCLE. (a) The first cycle of |
---|
31 | 31 | | the Legislative Budget Board's review of and reports concerning the |
---|
32 | 32 | | chapters of this title and Title 1, as required by Section 6.001, |
---|
33 | 33 | | shall be implemented as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) not later than December 1, 2010, the board shall |
---|
35 | 35 | | submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 11, |
---|
36 | 36 | | 13, and 30; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) not later than December 1, 2012, the board shall |
---|
38 | 38 | | submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 34, 41, 42, 43, |
---|
39 | 39 | | 44, 45, and 46; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) not later than December 1, 2014, the board shall |
---|
41 | 41 | | submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 12, 21, and 22; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (4) not later than December 1, 2016, the board shall |
---|
43 | 43 | | submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 18, 19, 25, 26, |
---|
44 | 44 | | 28, 29, 30A, 31, 32, 33, 37, and 38; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (5) not later than December 1, 2018, the board shall |
---|
46 | 46 | | submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapter 39. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (b) The board shall submit a subsequent report on each group |
---|
48 | 48 | | of the chapters described by Subsection (a)(1), (2), (3), (4), or |
---|
49 | 49 | | (5) not later than the 10th anniversary of the due date of the most |
---|
50 | 50 | | recent report on those chapters but may modify the reporting cycle |
---|
51 | 51 | | to the extent necessary to take into account changes in law, |
---|
52 | 52 | | including changes in the organization of the law. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
54 | 54 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
55 | 55 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
56 | 56 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
57 | 57 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|