Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB851 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R4836 CAS-D
 By: Eissler H.B. No. 851


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Legislative Budget Board review of and reports to
 certain state officials concerning the primary state statutes
 governing public education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 2, Education Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 6 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 6.  LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD REVIEW OF TITLES 1 AND 2;
 REPORTS TO STATE OFFICIALS
 Sec. 6.001.  REVIEW; REPORTS.  The Legislative Budget Board
 shall review the chapters of this title and Title 1 on a 10-year
 cycle.  Based on each review, the board shall submit a written
 report on the chapters reviewed to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 chair of each standing committee of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over public education.
 Sec. 6.002.  RECOMMENDATIONS. (a) Each report submitted
 under Section 6.001 must include any Legislative Budget Board
 recommendation that one or more provisions subject to review be:
 (1) eliminated; or
 (2)  amended to improve the effectiveness of the
 provision or of this state's public education system.
 (b)  Each recommendation under Subsection (a) must include a
 brief explanation of the basis for the recommendation.
 Sec. 6.003.  ESTABLISHMENT OF CYCLE. (a)  The first cycle of
 the Legislative Budget Board's review of and reports concerning the
 chapters of this title and Title 1, as required by Section 6.001,
 shall be implemented as follows:
 (1)  not later than December 1, 2010, the board shall
 submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 11,
 13, and 30;
 (2)  not later than December 1, 2012, the board shall
 submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 34, 41, 42, 43,
 44, 45, and 46;
 (3)  not later than December 1, 2014, the board shall
 submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 12, 21, and 22;
 (4)  not later than December 1, 2016, the board shall
 submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapters 18, 19, 25, 26,
 28, 29, 30A, 31, 32, 33, 37, and 38; and
 (5)  not later than December 1, 2018, the board shall
 submit the board's first-cycle report on Chapter 39.
 (b)  The board shall submit a subsequent report on each group
 of the chapters described by Subsection (a)(1), (2), (3), (4), or
 (5) not later than the 10th anniversary of the due date of the most
 recent report on those chapters but may modify the reporting cycle
 to the extent necessary to take into account changes in law,
 including changes in the organization of the law.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.