Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB865 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 865
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the establishment of the Texas Invasive Species
66 Coordinating Committee.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Title 7, Government Code, is amended by adding
99 Chapter 776 to read as follows:
1010 CHAPTER 776. TEXAS INVASIVE SPECIES COORDINATING COMMITTEE
1111 Sec. 776.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1212 (1) "Committee" means the Texas Invasive Species
1313 Coordinating Committee.
1414 (2) "Invasive species" means a species that is not
1515 native to an ecosystem and whose introduction to the ecosystem
1616 causes or has been demonstrated to cause economic harm,
1717 environmental harm, or harm to human health. Humans, domestic and
1818 exotic livestock, and non-harmful exotic organisms are not invasive
1919 species.
2020 Sec. 776.002. MEMBER AGENCIES. (a) The member agencies of
2121 the committee are:
2222 (1) the Department of Agriculture;
2323 (2) the Parks and Wildlife Department;
2424 (3) the State Soil and Water Conservation Board;
2525 (4) the Texas AgriLife Extension Service;
2626 (5) the Texas Forest Service;
2727 (6) the Texas Water Development Board; and
2828 (7) any other state agency added to the committee
2929 under Subsection (b).
3030 (b) On the request of a state agency that has an interest in
3131 controlling invasive species, the member agencies listed in
3232 Subsections (a)(1)-(6) by unanimous agreement may add the agency to
3333 the committee.
3434 Sec. 776.003. REPRESENTATIVES. (a) The committee is
3535 composed of one representative of each member agency. If an
3636 agency's representative is unable to attend a committee meeting or
3737 otherwise perform the representative's duties, the agency's
3838 alternate representative shall serve in the representative's
3939 place.
4040 (b) The administrative head of each member agency:
4141 (1) shall designate one individual to serve as the
4242 agency's representative on the committee and one individual to
4343 serve as alternate representative;
4444 (2) may change the designated representative or
4545 alternate representative at will; and
4646 (3) after designating or changing the representative
4747 or alternate representative, shall promptly notify the committee in
4848 writing of the name and position of the new representative or
4949 alternate representative.
5050 (c) Service on the committee by a state officer or employee
5151 is an additional duty of the representative's office or employment.
5252 Sec. 776.004. DUTIES. (a) The committee shall:
5353 (1) serve as a catalyst for cooperation between state
5454 agencies in the area of invasive species control;
5555 (2) facilitate governmental efforts, including
5656 efforts of local governments and special districts, to prevent and
5757 manage invasive species;
5858 (3) make recommendations to state agencies regarding
5959 research, technology transfer, and management actions related to
6060 invasive species control;
6161 (4) facilitate the exchange of information so that
6262 each member agency is informed of committee plans, recommendations,
6363 and proposals for research, education, and implementation of
6464 activities to:
6565 (A) prevent, detect, assess, monitor, contain,
6666 and control or eradicate invasive species; and
6767 (B) reduce environmental and economic threats
6868 and threats to human health from invasive species;
6969 (5) provide a forum for developing coordinated
7070 interagency strategies and policies for invasive species control;
7171 (6) provide technical information and input to
7272 regional and national invasive species control coordination
7373 efforts, including the National Invasive Species Management Plan;
7474 (7) facilitate the review of committee technical
7575 decisions and work product by specialists and interested persons;
7676 and
7777 (8) report as needed to the governor, lieutenant
7878 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives on committee
7979 plans, work product, and accomplishments.
8080 (b) Each member agency of the committee shall:
8181 (1) coordinate the agency's invasive species control
8282 activities with the committee and relevant coordinating bodies,
8383 including the National Invasive Species Council;
8484 (2) share with the committee the agency's technical
8585 expertise related to invasive species;
8686 (3) advise the committee of known invasive species
8787 threats to natural and agricultural resources; and
8888 (4) cooperate, to the extent allowed by law, in
8989 initiatives to obtain appropriations and grants for invasive
9090 species control.
9191 Sec. 776.005. BYLAWS. (a) The committee shall adopt bylaws
9292 governing the committee's operations.
9393 (b) The bylaws:
9494 (1) must provide a procedure to periodically elect one
9595 representative as committee chair;
9696 (2) must provide a procedure to call committee
9797 meetings;
9898 (3) must require the committee to meet at least
9999 annually; and
100100 (4) may provide for the creation of subcommittees and
101101 advisory committees.
102102 Sec. 776.006. STAFF; ATTACHMENT. (a) The committee is
103103 administratively attached to the State Soil and Water Conservation
104104 Board.
105105 (b) The State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall
106106 provide one full-time equivalent employee to serve as committee
107107 coordinator.
108108 Sec. 776.007. SUNSET PROVISION. (a) The committee is
109109 subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in
110110 existence as provided by that chapter, the committee is abolished
111111 and this chapter expires September 1, 2013.
112112 (b) To the extent that Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act) places
113113 a duty on a state agency subject to review under that chapter, the
114114 State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall perform the duty as it
115115 relates to the committee.
116116 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the
117117 administrative head of each member agency of the Texas Invasive
118118 Species Coordinating Committee shall designate the agency's
119119 initial representative and alternate representative as provided by
120120 Section 776.003, Government Code, as added by this Act.
121121 SECTION 3. Not later than February 1, 2010, the Texas
122122 Invasive Species Coordinating Committee shall hold its first
123123 meeting and adopt bylaws as required by Section 776.005, Government
124124 Code, as added by this Act.
125125 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
126126 ______________________________ ______________________________
127127 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
128128 I certify that H.B. No. 865 was passed by the House on April
129129 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
130130 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
131131 No. 865 on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1
132132 present, not voting.
133133 ______________________________
134134 Chief Clerk of the House
135135 I certify that H.B. No. 865 was passed by the Senate, with
136136 amendments, on May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
137137 ______________________________
138138 Secretary of the Senate
139139 APPROVED: __________________
140140 Date
141141 __________________
142142 Governor