Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB865 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 865


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Texas Invasive Species
 Coordinating Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Title 7, Government Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 776 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 776. TEXAS INVASIVE SPECIES COORDINATING COMMITTEE
 Sec. 776.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Committee" means the Texas Invasive Species
 Coordinating Committee.
 (2)  "Invasive species" means a species that is not
 native to an ecosystem and whose introduction to the ecosystem
 causes or has been demonstrated to cause economic harm,
 environmental harm, or harm to human health. Humans, domestic and
 exotic livestock, and non-harmful exotic organisms are not invasive
 species.
 Sec. 776.002.  MEMBER AGENCIES.  (a)  The member agencies of
 the committee are:
 (1) the Department of Agriculture;
 (2) the Parks and Wildlife Department;
 (3) the State Soil and Water Conservation Board;
 (4) the Texas AgriLife Extension Service;
 (5) the Texas Forest Service;
 (6) the Texas Water Development Board; and
 (7)  any other state agency added to the committee
 under Subsection (b).
 (b)  On the request of a state agency that has an interest in
 controlling invasive species, the member agencies listed in
 Subsections (a)(1)-(6) by unanimous agreement may add the agency to
 the committee.
 Sec. 776.003.  REPRESENTATIVES.  (a)  The committee is
 composed of one representative of each member agency. If an
 agency's representative is unable to attend a committee meeting or
 otherwise perform the representative's duties, the agency's
 alternate representative shall serve in the representative's
 place.
 (b) The administrative head of each member agency:
 (1)  shall designate one individual to serve as the
 agency's representative on the committee and one individual to
 serve as alternate representative;
 (2)  may change the designated representative or
 alternate representative at will; and
 (3)  after designating or changing the representative
 or alternate representative, shall promptly notify the committee in
 writing of the name and position of the new representative or
 alternate representative.
 (c)  Service on the committee by a state officer or employee
 is an additional duty of the representative's office or employment.
 Sec. 776.004. DUTIES. (a) The committee shall:
 (1)  serve as a catalyst for cooperation between state
 agencies in the area of invasive species control;
 (2)  facilitate governmental efforts, including
 efforts of local governments and special districts, to prevent and
 manage invasive species;
 (3)  make recommendations to state agencies regarding
 research, technology transfer, and management actions related to
 invasive species control;
 (4)  facilitate the exchange of information so that
 each member agency is informed of committee plans, recommendations,
 and proposals for research, education, and implementation of
 activities to:
 (A)  prevent, detect, assess, monitor, contain,
 and control or eradicate invasive species; and
 (B)  reduce environmental and economic threats
 and threats to human health from invasive species;
 (5)  provide a forum for developing coordinated
 interagency strategies and policies for invasive species control;
 (6)  provide technical information and input to
 regional and national invasive species control coordination
 efforts, including the National Invasive Species Management Plan;
 (7)  facilitate the review of committee technical
 decisions and work product by specialists and interested persons;
 and
 (8)  report as needed to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives on committee
 plans, work product, and accomplishments.
 (b) Each member agency of the committee shall:
 (1)  coordinate the agency's invasive species control
 activities with the committee and relevant coordinating bodies,
 including the National Invasive Species Council;
 (2)  share with the committee the agency's technical
 expertise related to invasive species;
 (3)  advise the committee of known invasive species
 threats to natural and agricultural resources; and
 (4)  cooperate, to the extent allowed by law, in
 initiatives to obtain appropriations and grants for invasive
 species control.
 Sec. 776.005.  BYLAWS.  (a)  The committee shall adopt bylaws
 governing the committee's operations.
 (b) The bylaws:
 (1)  must provide a procedure to periodically elect one
 representative as committee chair;
 (2)  must provide a procedure to call committee
 meetings;
 (3)  must require the committee to meet at least
 annually; and
 (4)  may provide for the creation of subcommittees and
 advisory committees.
 Sec. 776.006.  STAFF; ATTACHMENT.  (a)  The committee is
 administratively attached to the State Soil and Water Conservation
 Board.
 (b)  The State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall
 provide one full-time equivalent employee to serve as committee
 coordinator.
 Sec. 776.007.  SUNSET PROVISION.  (a)  The committee is
 subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in
 existence as provided by that chapter, the committee is abolished
 and this chapter expires September 1, 2013.
 (b)  To the extent that Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act) places
 a duty on a state agency subject to review under that chapter, the
 State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall perform the duty as it
 relates to the committee.
 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the
 administrative head of each member agency of the Texas Invasive
 Species Coordinating Committee shall designate the agency's
 initial representative and alternate representative as provided by
 Section 776.003, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. Not later than February 1, 2010, the Texas
 Invasive Species Coordinating Committee shall hold its first
 meeting and adopt bylaws as required by Section 776.005, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 865 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 865 on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 865 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor