Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1948 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#488 | Journal Page: 2283 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2283 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2283 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Amended | 1-Martinez | Journal Page: 2240 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |