Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB94 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hodge (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 94
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of laws awarding credit to an inmate for
 time between release on and subsequent revocation of parole,
 mandatory supervision, or conditional pardon.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Notwithstanding Section 11, Chapter 856, Acts of
 the 77th Legislature, Regular Session, 2001, the change in law made
 by Section 7 of that Act to Section 508.283, Government Code,
 applies to the calculation of the remaining sentence for an inmate
 whose release on parole, mandatory supervision, or conditional
 pardon is revoked regardless of whether the revocation occurred
 before, on, or after September 1, 2001.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2010.
 * * * * *