1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 101 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may |
---|
6 | 6 | | comfort those saddened by the death of Jeniavee Hatcher of Paris, |
---|
7 | 7 | | Texas, who passed away on February 9, 2009, one week before her 88th |
---|
8 | 8 | | birthday; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Born in Commerce on February 16, 1921, Jenny Cruse |
---|
10 | 10 | | was the youngest of six children of John and Jessie Cruse and |
---|
11 | 11 | | enjoyed the companionship of two brothers and three sisters; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, She married Carl Ray Hatcher on January 21, 1938, |
---|
13 | 13 | | and the couple settled in the Marvin community in Lamar County, |
---|
14 | 14 | | where Mrs. Hatcher lived the majority of her life; she and her |
---|
15 | 15 | | husband shared a rewarding relationship, and together they raised |
---|
16 | 16 | | three children, Johnny, Judy, and Susan, and happily welcomed seven |
---|
17 | 17 | | grandchildren, nine great-grandchildren, and three |
---|
18 | 18 | | great-great-grandchildren into their family; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, In addition to taking care of her family, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Mrs. Hatcher worked at a local retail store and at Safeway grocery, |
---|
21 | 21 | | and for more than 17 years she was employed with Westinghouse Lamp |
---|
22 | 22 | | Division; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, A kind woman of steadfast faith, Jenny Hatcher was |
---|
24 | 24 | | an active congregant at Bethel Baptist Church for 61 years, serving |
---|
25 | 25 | | as church treasurer, clerk, and Sunday school teacher; she also |
---|
26 | 26 | | supported the activities of the East Lamar PTA and the Jennings Home |
---|
27 | 27 | | Demonstration Club; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | WHEREAS, Jenny Hatcher was beloved for her warmth, |
---|
29 | 29 | | graciousness, and beautiful smile, and she will forever hold a |
---|
30 | 30 | | treasured place in the hearts of all who knew and loved her; now, |
---|
31 | 31 | | therefore, be it |
---|
32 | 32 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
33 | 33 | | hereby pay tribute to the life of Jeniavee Hatcher and extend |
---|
34 | 34 | | sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband of 71 |
---|
35 | 35 | | years, Carl Hatcher; to her children, Johnny Hatcher and his wife, |
---|
36 | 36 | | Sandra, and Judy Pomroy and her husband, Bobby; to her |
---|
37 | 37 | | grandchildren, Debbie, Kristi, Jana, Shannon, and John; to her |
---|
38 | 38 | | great-grandchildren, Ashley, Jeremy, Heather, Danielle, Jacob, |
---|
39 | 39 | | Colton, Hailey, Brandon, and Erin; to her |
---|
40 | 40 | | great-great-grandchildren; to her brother-in-law, Charles Hatcher, |
---|
41 | 41 | | and his wife, Mildred; and to her other relatives and friends; and, |
---|
42 | 42 | | be it further |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
44 | 44 | | prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
45 | 45 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
46 | 46 | | Jenny Hatcher. |
---|
47 | 47 | | Homer |
---|
48 | 48 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
50 | 50 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
51 | 51 | | rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009. |
---|
52 | 52 | | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
54 | 54 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
55 | 55 | | rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | 58 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Date |
---|
60 | 60 | | __________________ |
---|
61 | 61 | | Governor |
---|