Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR101 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 101


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may
 comfort those saddened by the death of Jeniavee Hatcher of Paris,
 Texas, who passed away on February 9, 2009, one week before her 88th
 birthday; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Commerce on February 16, 1921, Jenny Cruse
 was the youngest of six children of John and Jessie Cruse and
 enjoyed the companionship of two brothers and three sisters; and
 WHEREAS, She married Carl Ray Hatcher on January 21, 1938,
 and the couple settled in the Marvin community in Lamar County,
 where Mrs. Hatcher lived the majority of her life; she and her
 husband shared a rewarding relationship, and together they raised
 three children, Johnny, Judy, and Susan, and happily welcomed seven
 grandchildren, nine great-grandchildren, and three
 great-great-grandchildren into their family; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to taking care of her family,
 Mrs. Hatcher worked at a local retail store and at Safeway grocery,
 and for more than 17 years she was employed with Westinghouse Lamp
 Division; and
 WHEREAS, A kind woman of steadfast faith, Jenny Hatcher was
 an active congregant at Bethel Baptist Church for 61 years, serving
 as church treasurer, clerk, and Sunday school teacher; she also
 supported the activities of the East Lamar PTA and the Jennings Home
 Demonstration Club; and
 WHEREAS, Jenny Hatcher was beloved for her warmth,
 graciousness, and beautiful smile, and she will forever hold a
 treasured place in the hearts of all who knew and loved her; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Jeniavee Hatcher and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband of 71
 years, Carl Hatcher; to her children, Johnny Hatcher and his wife,
 Sandra, and Judy Pomroy and her husband, Bobby; to her
 grandchildren, Debbie, Kristi, Jana, Shannon, and John; to her
 great-grandchildren, Ashley, Jeremy, Heather, Danielle, Jacob,
 Colton, Hailey, Brandon, and Erin; to her
 great-great-grandchildren; to her brother-in-law, Charles Hatcher,
 and his wife, Mildred; and to her other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Jenny Hatcher.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 101 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor