Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR102 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 102


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The loved ones of Juanita Daughtrey of Powderly were
 greatly saddened by her passing on February 8, 2009, at the age of
 86; and
 WHEREAS, Born on January 9, 1923, in Lawton, Oklahoma, the
 former Nita Blaylock was the daughter of Richard and Julia
 Blaylock; she graduated from Lawton High School and attended
 Cameron College in her hometown; in 1942, she became the wife of
 Orie Daughtrey and with him shared a fulfilling relationship until
 the time of his passing in 1977; fortunate to find love a second
 time, she married Leslie Turner, who passed away in 1994; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Daughtrey was employed as a legal secretary
 with the civil service at Fort Sill, Oklahoma, and Camp Campbell,
 Kentucky, and in the offices of Dick and Brad Hutchison in Paris,
 Texas, and she was a teacher's aide at Aaron Parker Elementary
 School in Powderly; and
 WHEREAS, A member of the Woman's Missionary Union at Bounds
 Baptist Church, she taught Sunday school and served her fellow
 congregants as librarian, secretary, and treasurer; Mrs. Daughtrey
 further supported her community as a literacy program volunteer
 tutor and member of the Order of the Eastern Star; in her leisure
 time, she enjoyed playing table games, reading, and cooking; and
 WHEREAS, Nita Daughtrey lived a caring and purposeful life,
 and she will forever hold a treasured place in the hearts of those
 fortunate enough to have shared in her love and friendship; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Juanita Daughtrey and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children,
 Peggy Carpenter and her husband, Gene, and Sonny Daughtrey and his
 wife, Judy; to her grandchildren and their spouses, Brent and Wendy
 Chadwick, Angie and Jeremy Wheat, Cassidy and Ernie Emeyabbi,
 Bailee Roberts, Kevin and Kelli Carpenter, and Terrilynn Carpenter;
 to her great-grandchildren, Laramie, Jaylen, Braden, Chloe, Ana
 Claire, Kade, and Kasen; to her sisters, Colleen Green and June
 Rosheim; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Nita Daughtrey.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 102 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 102 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor