Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR103 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 103


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Carl
 Walter Smith of Paris, Texas, who died on January 19, 2009, at the
 age of 84; and
 WHEREAS, Carl Smith was born on February 16, 1924, to Clinton
 and Gladys Smith in New Bedford, Massachusetts; he served his
 country as a member of the United States Army during World War II,
 helping to build Camp Maxey; and
 WHEREAS, Following the war, Mr. Smith worked for the Lamar
 Creamery Company in Paris; later, he was a manager for the Paris
 Goodyear Store as well as the Firestone Tire Company in Bonham,
 where he and his wife also owned and operated a furniture store;
 returning to Paris, he worked in maintenance at Paris High School
 for a decade until his retirement; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Smith was the father of three daughters, Carla
 Floyd, Barbara Jacinto, and the late Donna Wright; he was a member
 of the Baptist faith and devoted himself to local sports activities
 as a baseball umpire and basketball referee; and
 WHEREAS, Though he is deeply missed, Carl Smith will long be
 remembered with great admiration and affection by those fortunate
 enough to have shared in the richness of his life; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Carl Walter Smith and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his daughters,
 Carla Floyd and Barbara Jacinto and her husband, Tony; to the mother
 of his children, Eloise Smith; to his grandchildren, Jay Armstrong
 and his wife, Tonya, Mitzi Springer and her husband, Jerry, Lori
 Johnson and her husband, Chap, Robin McCarthy and her husband,
 Kevin, Wesley Armstrong, and Shawn Robertson; to his brother,
 Clinton Smith, Jr.; to his sister-in-law, Peggy Smith; to his 16
 great-grandchildren and 2 great-great-grandchildren; and to his
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Carl Walter Smith.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 103 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 103 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor