Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR104 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 104


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Billy
 Joe Patterson of Brookston, who passed away on February 18, 2009, at
 the age of 76; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 23, 1932, to Sherman and Opal Patterson
 in Lamar County, Billy Joe Patterson graduated from West Lamar High
 School and served aboard the U.S.S. Saipan during the Korean War in
 the early 1950s; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Patterson was employed by Babcock and Wilcox for
 33 years; after retiring from that job in 1988, he worked for
 Tractor Supply and Whitaker Pawn; a member of Brookston Baptist
 Church, Mr. Patterson was an ordained minister who served
 congregations in Fannin and Delta Counties; and
 WHEREAS, In all of his endeavors, he enjoyed the love and
 support of his wife, the former Barbara Carpenter; the couple were
 married in 1955 and had the pleasure of welcoming two sons, Edwin
 and James, as well as six grandchildren and a great-grandchild into
 their family; and
 WHEREAS, Although he is greatly missed, Billy Joe Patterson
 leaves behind a wealth of memories that will be treasured by all
 those who were fortunate enough to share in his company through the
 years; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Billy Joe Patterson and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Barbara
 Patterson; to his sons, Edwin Joe Patterson and James Bartley
 Patterson and his wife, Susan; to his grandchildren, Shelton and
 Joseph Patterson, Lesli Donaldson, and Drew, Kaitlyn, and Jacy
 Patterson; to his great-grandson, Tony Donaldson; to his brothers,
 L. P. "Pete" Patterson and his wife, Doris, Weldon Patterson and his
 wife, Ellen, and Ted White and his wife, Carol; to his sisters, Faye
 Harris and her husband, Glen, and Ann Brockway and her husband,
 James; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Billy Joe Patterson.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 104 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 104 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor