Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR105 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 105


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Monroe
 Travis Hardin of Paris, Texas, who passed away on February 20, 2009,
 at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, "Tom" Hardin was born in Bagwell on August 6, 1937,
 to Travis H. Hardin and Jesse Jackson Hardin; and
 WHEREAS, Answering his nation's call to duty, Mr. Hardin was
 a career member of the U.S. Air Force, serving for 23 years all
 across the nation, in New York, Virginia, Massachusetts, Nevada,
 Idaho, Texas, and Alaska, where he was stationed not far from the
 North Pole; he also served with distinction in locales around the
 world, such as Taiwan, Pakistan, Germany, and Thailand, where he
 earned the Bronze Star; he retired in 1977 as a senior master
 sergeant; and
 WHEREAS, Returning to civilian life, Mr. Hardin studied air
 conditioning, refrigeration, and heating at Paris Junior College,
 and then started an appliance repair business; and
 WHEREAS, This accomplished Texan was active in his community
 as a member of Paris Masonic Lodge No. 27 and Detroit Masonic Lodge
 No. 531, and he was also a member of Oak Park United Methodist
 Church; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted husband, father, and grandfather, Tom
 Hardin dedicated himself to his family, his community, and his
 country, and memories of him will forever endure in the hearts of
 all those who knew and loved him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Monroe Travis Hardin and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife of 50
 years, Ann Dorman Hardin; to his son, Roy T. Hardin, and his wife,
 Renee; to his daughters, Suzanne Barnes and Janell Himes and her
 husband, Brian; to his grandchildren, Travis Hardin, Brandon
 Barnes, Tommy Hardin, Jessica Himes, Jackson Barnes, Amanda Himes,
 and Tucker Hardin; to his brothers, David Hardin and George Hardin;
 to his sister, Clara Burgess; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Monroe Travis Hardin.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 105 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 105 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor