Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR107 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 107


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Roslyn
 Davis Sample of Powderly, who died on February 18, 2009, at the age
 of 81; and
 WHEREAS, Roslyn Davis was born on November 11, 1927, to Lloyd
 and Evelyn Coursey Davis; she was joined in matrimony to Tom Sample
 in 1945, and together they were blessed with a daughter, a
 grandchild, three great-grandchildren, and two
 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout her adult life, Mrs. Sample served her
 community as a volunteer, working with the American Red Cross, the
 Girl Scouts, the Maxey House, Family Haven, the Retired and Senior
 Volunteer Program, and other organizations; she served on the
 boards of RSVP and the Northeast Texas Council on Alcohol and Drug
 Abuse; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Sample was especially active as a supporter of
 Paris Junior College, beginning with her work as an adult education
 outreach counselor from 1980 to 1982; starting in 1993, she served
 on many committees and projects of the school's Alumni and Friends
 Association; she chaired the scholarship endowment fund-raising
 luncheon, and she was a longtime member of the college's alumni
 board, including three terms as president, from 1996 to 1999; for
 her tireless efforts in behalf of the school, she was named a
 Distinguished Friend of Paris Junior College in 2002; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted wife, mother, and grandmother, Roslyn
 Sample dedicated her life to her family and to the betterment of her
 community, and the memory of her energy and her commitment to others
 will continue to inspire all who were fortunate enough to know her;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Roslyn Davis Sample and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her husband of
 63 years, Tom Sample; to her daughter, Linda Sample Bratcher, and
 her husband, Richard; to her granddaughter, Sarah Upchurch; to her
 great-grandchildren, Sara Beth Upchurch, Cody Upchurch and his
 wife, Mallory, and Charli Gabeline and her husband, Chad; to her
 great-great-grandchildren, Gavin Upchurch and Kylar Gabeline; to
 her sister, Bille Viehe, and her husband, Mike; to her nephew, Mike
 Viehe, Jr., and his wife, Brigitte, and their two daughters,
 Brittany and Blair; to her special friend, Annie; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate and House of
 Representatives adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Roslyn
 Davis Sample.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 107 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 107 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor