Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR108 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 108


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Bishop Othoe Stegall of Lubbock, who passed away on
 February 17, 2009, at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Afton, Bishop Stegall was born on
 October 25, 1923, to Lee Franklin and Alice Ash Stegall; he served
 his country with distinction during World War II as a member of the
 U.S. Air Force 8th Fighter Squadron; and
 WHEREAS, Following his military service, Bishop Stegall was
 self-employed with an automotive upholstery business until 1950,
 when he became an ordained minister; he was licensed to preach by
 the Church of God at the age of 25, and in 1954 he was ordained as a
 bishop; and
 WHEREAS, Bishop Stegall shared his spiritual guidance with
 churches in Stephenville, Brownfield, Sweetwater, Dallas and Fort
 Worth, and Paris; he was pastor at Paris Church of God from 1960
 until 1974 and later served as interim pastor for Pathway Church of
 God; throughout his ministerial career, he inspired his
 congregations with his leadership, faith, and vision; and
 WHEREAS, Devoted to his family, he was married to his wife,
 Pearl, for more than half a century, and together they raised three
 children, David, Sue, and Pat; and
 WHEREAS, Othoe Stegall will be deeply missed, but he leaves
 behind a legacy that will forever be treasured by all those who
 shared in the richness of his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Bishop Othoe Stegall and extend
 deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Pearl
 Stegall; to his children, David Stegall and his wife, Anita, Sue
 Boyd and her husband, Foy, and Pat Byas and her husband, Gerald; to
 his grandchildren, Sharee and Jacky Howard, Alice Byas, and Shanna
 and Chris Whitney; to his great-grandchildren, Baylee, Wade, and
 Harlee Whitney and Lexi Howard; to his brother, Henry Rollins, Jr.;
 to his sister, Mary Curby; and to his other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Bishop Othoe Stegall.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 108 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 108 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor