1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 110 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, A full and purposeful life came to an end with the |
---|
6 | 6 | | passing of Mary Jo Floyd Hughes of Belk on February 11, 2009, at the |
---|
7 | 7 | | age of 83; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Born on April 3, 1925, to Earl Kelley and Lillian |
---|
9 | 9 | | Floyd of Lamar County, the former Mary Jo Floyd grew up on a family |
---|
10 | 10 | | farm with nine brothers and sisters; she graduated from Deport High |
---|
11 | 11 | | School in 1942 and went on to work as a bookkeeper and typist for |
---|
12 | 12 | | First National Bank in Paris, Texas; she later became secretary to |
---|
13 | 13 | | the manager of Lamar Cotton Oil Company and, in 1946, secretary to |
---|
14 | 14 | | the district manager of Texas Power and Light Company; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, This beloved Texan married Joel B. Hughes on |
---|
16 | 16 | | December 8, 1946, and the couple lived in Belk, where they owned and |
---|
17 | 17 | | operated the Hughes Ranch during their 63 rewarding years of |
---|
18 | 18 | | marriage; the couple were blessed with two children, Bradley and |
---|
19 | 19 | | Joella, and had the pleasure of welcoming a grandson, Rhett, into |
---|
20 | 20 | | the family; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | WHEREAS, Mrs. Hughes devoted herself to home life for several |
---|
22 | 22 | | years, raising her children and tending her ranch with the same |
---|
23 | 23 | | dedication and skill that she brought to her professional |
---|
24 | 24 | | endeavors; her passion for business administration returned once |
---|
25 | 25 | | her children reached school age, and she began a 40-year tenure as |
---|
26 | 26 | | office manager for Fry-Gibbs Funeral Home; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, An active member of the community, Mrs. Hughes |
---|
28 | 28 | | belonged to the Paris Business and Professional Women's Club for 63 |
---|
29 | 29 | | years and served as its president, and she was a congregant of |
---|
30 | 30 | | Calvary United Methodist Church; in addition, she took an active |
---|
31 | 31 | | role in the movement for gender equality in the workplace, |
---|
32 | 32 | | mentoring and encouraging young women to take their place as |
---|
33 | 33 | | leaders in the business world; the widespread respect she earned |
---|
34 | 34 | | for her own career achievements was reflected in her selection as |
---|
35 | 35 | | Business Woman of the Year in 1981; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, Mary Jo Hughes approached each of her pursuits with |
---|
37 | 37 | | unflagging optimism and enthusiasm, bringing happiness to many |
---|
38 | 38 | | along the way; although she is deeply missed, those fortunate |
---|
39 | 39 | | enough to have known her will forever treasure their memories of |
---|
40 | 40 | | time spent in her company; now, therefore, be it |
---|
41 | 41 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
42 | 42 | | hereby pay tribute to the life of Mary Jo Floyd Hughes and extend |
---|
43 | 43 | | sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, Joel |
---|
44 | 44 | | B. Hughes; to her children, Bradley W. Hughes and Joella Hughes |
---|
45 | 45 | | Lucas and her husband, Carl; to her grandson, Rhett Hughes |
---|
46 | 46 | | Hutchens; to her brother, Kelley W. Floyd; to her special friends, |
---|
47 | 47 | | Michael Singer, Joyce Kenney, and Elsie Parson; and to her other |
---|
48 | 48 | | relatives and friends; and, be it further |
---|
49 | 49 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
50 | 50 | | prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
51 | 51 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
52 | 52 | | Mary Jo Hughes. |
---|
53 | 53 | | Homer |
---|
54 | 54 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
56 | 56 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 110 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
57 | 57 | | rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009. |
---|
58 | 58 | | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | 60 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 110 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
61 | 61 | | rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009. |
---|
62 | 62 | | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | 64 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Date |
---|
66 | 66 | | __________________ |
---|
67 | 67 | | Governor |
---|